AL SB127 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Delivered to Governor at 2:20 p.m. on March 8, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Delivered to Governor at 2:20 p.m. on March 8, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Volunteer firefighter and volunteer emergency medical service providers, subpoenaed as witness in civil action, per diem and mileage authorized under certain conditions
Title
Volunteer firefighter and volunteer emergency medical service providers, subpoenaed as witness in civil action, per diem and mileage authorized under certain conditions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-09 | Delivered to Governor at 2:20 p.m. on March 8, 2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Assigned Act No. 2010-218. | |
2010-03-09 | Enrolled | |
2010-03-09 | Signature Requested | |
2010-03-04 | Passed Second House | |
2010-03-04 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 509 | |
2010-03-04 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-16 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary | |
2010-02-11 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 172 | |
2010-02-11 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-01-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-01-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |