AL SB126 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Assigned Act No. 2021-188.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Alcoholic beverages, delivery service license, established, requirements for issuance, limits on delivery of beer, wine, and spirits, Secs. 28-1-4, 28-3-1, 28-3A-13, 28-3A-14 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverages, delivery service license, established, requirements for issuance, limits on delivery of beer, wine, and spirits, Secs. 28-1-4, 28-3-1, 28-3A-13, 28-3A-14 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 780 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 595 (Y: 79 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 594 (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Isbell motion to Table Roll Call 593 (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - HBIR: Isbell motion to Adopt Roll Call 592 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 198 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 197 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt Roll Call 196 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - SBIR: Waggoner motion to Adopt Roll Call 124 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07SenateAssigned Act No. 2021-188.
2021-04-07HouseSignature Requested
2021-04-07SenateEnrolled
2021-04-06HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2021-04-06SenateWaggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 780
2021-04-06SenateConcurrence Requested
2021-04-01HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 595
2021-04-01HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 594
2021-04-01HouseIsbell Amendment Offered
2021-04-01HouseIsbell motion to Table adopted Roll Call 593
2021-04-01HouseJudiciary Amendment Offered
2021-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed
2021-02-24HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2021-02-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
2021-02-11SenateEngrossed
2021-02-11SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 198
2021-02-11SenateMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 197
2021-02-11SenateWhatley Amendment Offered
2021-02-11SenateWaggoner motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 196
2021-02-11SenateWaggoner Amendment Offered
2021-02-11SenateThird Reading Passed
2021-02-09SenateWaggoner motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2021-02-09SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2021-02-03SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-02-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

HB229 (Same As) 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
SB128 (Same As) 2021-02-02 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2814Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2831Amended CodeSee Bill Text
283A13Amended CodeSee Bill Text
283A14Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB126&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB126-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB126-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB126-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/209791-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/209972-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/210569-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/211620-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/209768-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/210052-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/210323-1.pdf
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41550.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41917.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41995.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41791.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=644190&VOTE=124&BODY=S&INST=SBIR%20for%20SB126&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=645374&VOTE=196&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=645376&VOTE=197&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=645377&VOTE=198&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=654453&VOTE=592&BODY=H&INST=HBIR%20for%20SB126&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=654457&VOTE=593&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=654463&VOTE=594&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=654464&VOTE=595&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=655559&VOTE=780&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback