AL SB126 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Corrections Department, contract with a county commission to establish regional detention facility to house state and county offenders, authorized, design, construction, maintenance, operation, contract period and fee, sheriff to manage and provide work for offenders
Title
Corrections Department, contract with a county commission to establish regional detention facility to house state and county offenders, authorized, design, construction, maintenance, operation, contract period and fee, sheriff to manage and provide work for offenders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely Postponed | |
2010-03-04 | Barron motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted | |
2010-03-04 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 443 | |
2010-03-04 | Barron second Substitute Offered | |
2010-03-04 | Barron tabled Barron substitute | |
2010-03-04 | French tabled French Amendment | |
2010-03-04 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2010-02-11 | Barron motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-02-11 | French Amendment Offered | |
2010-02-11 | Further Consideration | |
2010-02-11 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2010-02-11 | Motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-02-11 | Barron first Substitute Offered | |
2010-02-11 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2010-02-02 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-01-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |