AL SB125 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 23 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - Second House Concurs in Veto Override
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 23 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - Second House Concurs in Veto Override
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
General Fund budget, appropriations for other functions of government, debt service, and capital outlay for fiscal year ending September 30, 2017.
Title
General Fund budget, appropriations for other functions of government, debt service, and capital outlay for fiscal year ending September 30, 2017.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-05 - House - Clouse motion to Read a Third Time, Veto to the Contrary Not Withstanding (Y: 71 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Marsh motion to Read a Third Time, Veto to the Contrary Not Withstanding (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Rules Committee Petiton to Cease Debate (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - Senate - Pittman motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - Senate - Pittman motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - Senate - Pittman motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - Clouse motion to Table (Y: 72 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - Clouse motion to Table (Y: 62 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - Clouse motion to Table (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - Clouse motion to Table (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 71 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Pittman motion to Table (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Holley motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Marsh motion to Read a Third Time, Veto to the Contrary Not Withstanding (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Rules Committee Petiton to Cease Debate (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - Senate - Pittman motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - Senate - Pittman motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - Senate - Pittman motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - Clouse motion to Table (Y: 72 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - Clouse motion to Table (Y: 62 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - Clouse motion to Table (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - Clouse motion to Table (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 71 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Pittman motion to Table (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Holley motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | Senate | Second House Concurs in Veto Override |
2016-04-05 | House | Morrow intended to vote "Nay" |
2016-04-05 | House | Clouse motion to Read a Third Time, Veto to the Contrary Not Withstanding adopted Roll Call 509 |
2016-04-05 | House | House of Origin Overrides Veto |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Marsh motion to Read a Third Time, Veto to the Contrary Not Withstanding adopted Roll Call 510 |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Forwarded to Governor |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Rules Committee Petiton to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 507 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-03-23 | House | Signature Requested |
2016-03-23 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Pittman motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 503 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Singleton motion to Reconsider adopted Voice Vote |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Singleton motion to Reconsider - Pittman motion to Table Singleton motion to Reconsider Lost Voice Vote |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Pittman motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 502 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2016-03-15 | House | Daniels intended to vote "Nay" |
2016-03-15 | House | Wilcox intended to vote "Abstain" and Sanderford intended to vote "Yea" |
2016-03-15 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 300 |
2016-03-15 | House | Clouse motion to Table adopted Roll Call 299 |
2016-03-15 | House | Hurst intended to vote "Nay" |
2016-03-15 | House | Knight Amendment Offered |
2016-03-15 | House | Clouse motion to Table adopted Roll Call 298 |
2016-03-15 | House | Bracy Amendment Offered |
2016-03-15 | House | Clouse motion to Table adopted Roll Call 297 |
2016-03-15 | House | Ford Amendment Offered |
2016-03-15 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 296 |
2016-03-15 | House | Clouse Amendment Offered |
2016-03-15 | House | Clouse motion to Table adopted Roll Call 295 |
2016-03-15 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 294 |
2016-03-15 | House | Ways and Means General Fund Amendment Offered |
2016-03-15 | House | Ways and Means General Fund first Substitute Offered |
2016-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-10 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment |
2016-03-01 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 214 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Pittman motion to Table adopted Roll Call 213 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Ward Amendment Offered |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 212 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Ward Amendment Offered |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt Lost Roll Call 211 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Holley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 210 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Holley Amendment Offered |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 209 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund first Substitute Offered |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |