AL SB121 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:28 a.m. on April 22, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:28 a.m. on April 22, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Highways and other roads, Alabama Trust Fund, $100 million transferred annually in 2010 to 2020, inclusive, distrib. of portion after appropriation to Transportation Department, portions earmarked for special projects, distrib. of portion to counties and municipalities for transportation purposes, transfers from Alabama Trust Fund to Municipal Government Capital Improvement Fund and County Government Capital Improvement Fund, const. amend.
Title
Highways and other roads, Alabama Trust Fund, $100 million transferred annually in 2010 to 2020, inclusive, distrib. of portion after appropriation to Transportation Department, portions earmarked for special projects, distrib. of portion to counties and municipalities for transportation purposes, transfers from Alabama Trust Fund to Municipal Government Capital Improvement Fund and County Government Capital Improvement Fund, const. amend.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:28 a.m. on April 22, 2010 | |
2010-04-22 | Assigned Act No. 2010-555. | |
2010-04-22 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-22 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-22 | Concurred in Conference Report | |
2010-04-21 | Beasley motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1120 | |
2010-04-21 | Beasley substitute motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1119 | |
2010-04-21 | Buskey motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee tabled | |
2010-04-21 | Beasley motion to Concur In and Adopt pending | |
2010-04-21 | Conference Report Concurrence Requested | |
2010-04-21 | Conference Committee on SB121 2010RS first Substitute Offered | |
2010-04-21 | Barron motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1125 | |
2010-04-21 | Conference Report | |
2010-04-14 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-14 | Guin motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 1074 House appoints Beasley, Rogers and Clouse | |
2010-04-14 | Conference Committee Requested | |
2010-04-14 | Barron motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1060 P&PO appoints Barron, Singleton and Smith | |
2010-04-14 | Concurrence Requested | |
2010-04-13 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1011 | |
2010-04-13 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1010 | |
2010-04-13 | Drake Amendment Offered | |
2010-04-13 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1009 | |
2010-04-13 | Scott 2nd Amendment Offered | |
2010-04-13 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1008 | |
2010-04-13 | Scott 1st Amendment Offered | |
2010-04-13 | Motion to Adopt McCutchjeon amendment adopted Roll Call 1007 | |
2010-04-13 | Buskey motion to Table lost Roll Call 1006 | |
2010-04-13 | McCutcheon Amendment Offered | |
2010-04-13 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1005 | |
2010-04-13 | Baker (L) Amendment Offered | |
2010-04-13 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1004 | |
2010-04-13 | Allen Amendment Offered | |
2010-04-13 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1003 | |
2010-04-13 | Rogers Amendment #2 Offered | |
2010-04-13 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1002 | |
2010-04-13 | Thomas (J) substitute Amendment to Barton amendment #2 Offered | |
2010-04-13 | Buskey motion to Table his amendment adopted Roll Call 1001 | |
2010-04-13 | Lindsey motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-04-13 | Beasley motion to Table Buskey Substitute Amendment lost Roll Call 970 | |
2010-04-13 | Buskey Substitute Amendment to Barton amendment #2 Offered | |
2010-04-13 | Barton 2nd Amendment Offered | |
2010-04-13 | Motion to Adopt Rogers amendment #1 lost Roll Call 969 | |
2010-04-13 | Sherer motion to Previous Question lost Roll Call 968 | |
2010-04-13 | McCampbell motion to Table lost Roll Call 964 | |
2010-04-13 | Ison motion to remove from table adopted Roll Call 963 | |
2010-04-13 | Beasley motion to Table adopted Roll Call 962 | |
2010-04-13 | Rogers Amendment #1 Offered | |
2010-04-13 | Beasley motion to Table adopted Roll Call 961 | |
2010-04-13 | Davis Amendment Offered | |
2010-04-13 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 960 | |
2010-04-13 | Bentley Amendment Offered | |
2010-04-13 | Beasley motion to Table adopted Roll Call 959 | |
2010-04-13 | Beasley motion to Table lost Roll Call 958 | |
2010-04-13 | Barton Amendment #1 Offered | |
2010-04-13 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 957 | |
2010-04-13 | Moore (M) Amendment Offered | |
2010-04-13 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-13 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2010-04-13 | Beasley motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-04-13 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 956 | |
2010-04-13 | Government Appropriations first Substitute Offered | |
2010-04-13 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2010-04-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2010-03-23 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Government Appropriations | |
2010-03-23 | Engrossed | |
2010-03-11 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 521 | |
2010-03-11 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 520 | |
2010-03-11 | Barron motion to Table adopted Roll Call 519 | |
2010-03-11 | Pittman Amendment Offered | |
2010-03-11 | Barron motion to Table adopted Roll Call 518 | |
2010-03-11 | Sanford Amendment Offered | |
2010-03-11 | Barron motion to Table adopted Roll Call 517 | |
2010-03-11 | Orr first Substitute Offered | |
2010-03-11 | Barron motion to Table adopted Roll Call 516 | |
2010-03-11 | Pittman Amendment to Barron Substitute Offered. | |
2010-03-11 | Barron motion to Table adopted Roll Call 515 | |
2010-03-11 | Brooks Amendment No. 2 to Barron Substitute Offered. | |
2010-03-11 | Barron motion to Table adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-03-11 | Brooks Amendment Offered | |
2010-03-11 | Motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-03-11 | Barron Amendment to Barron Substitute Offered. | |
2010-03-11 | Barron first Substitute Offered | |
2010-03-11 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-02 | Motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 28 | |
2010-02-02 | Petition to Close Debate | |
2010-02-02 | Barron motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-02-02 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2010-01-28 | Unfinished Business | |
2010-01-28 | Barron Tabled Orr amendment as amended adopted Roll Call 25. | |
2010-01-28 | Motion to Adopt Barron substitute amendment adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-01-28 | Barron Substitute Amendment for Orr Amendment Offered. | |
2010-01-28 | Orr Amendment Offered | |
2010-01-28 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 24 | |
2010-01-28 | Sanford Amendment Offered | |
2010-01-28 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 23 | |
2010-01-28 | Means Amendment Offered | |
2010-01-28 | Coleman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 22 | |
2010-01-28 | Coleman and Bedford Amendment Offered | |
2010-01-28 | Barron motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 21 | |
2010-01-28 | Barron, Butler, Orr, Mitchem Amendment Offered. | |
2010-01-28 | Butler motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 20 | |
2010-01-28 | Barron , Butler, Orr, Mitchem, Bedford, Sanford Amendment Offered. | |
2010-01-28 | Brooks motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 19 | |
2010-01-28 | Further Consideration of Brooks Amendment | |
2010-01-28 | Unfinished Business | |
2010-01-26 | Unfinished Business | |
2010-01-26 | Brooks Amendment Offered | |
2010-01-26 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 15 | |
2010-01-26 | Further Consideration F&T Committee Amendment | |
2010-01-26 | Unfinished Business | |
2010-01-21 | Unfinished Business | |
2010-01-21 | Further Consideration | |
2010-01-19 | Unfinished Business | |
2010-01-19 | Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered | |
2010-01-19 | Unfinished Business | |
2010-01-14 | Reported from Finance and Taxation General Fund as Favorable with 1 amendment | |
2010-01-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |