AL SB11 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-07 - Assigned Act No. 2015-523.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Russell Co. volunteer fire departments, fire protection service fees authorized for certain property outside corp. limits of Phenix City, exemptions, collection, purposes, uses, distribution of funds, provided for, referendum

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Russell Co. volunteer fire departments, fire protection service fees authorized for certain property outside corp. limits of Phenix City, exemptions, collection, purposes, uses, distribution of funds, provided for, referendum

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-08-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 68 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2015-08-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-08-04 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-07SenateAssigned Act No. 2015-523.
2015-08-07HouseSignature Requested
2015-08-07SenateEnrolled
2015-08-07SenatePassed Second House
2015-08-07HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 34
2015-08-07HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-08-06HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-08-04SenateEngrossed
2015-08-04HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
2015-08-04SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 16
2015-08-04SenateMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 15
2015-08-04SenateLocal Legislation first Substitute Offered
2015-08-04SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-08-03SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2015-07-13SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback