AL SB109 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Taxation, tax credit, employer provided a tax credit for employing an apprentice, definitions, Apprenticeship Tax Credit Act
Title
Taxation, tax credit, employer provided a tax credit for employing an apprentice, definitions, Apprenticeship Tax Credit Act
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Bussman motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Bussman motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | Senate | |
2015-06-04 | House | Buskey intended to vote "Yea" |
2015-06-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1271 |
2015-06-04 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1270 |
2015-06-04 | House | Ways and Means Education Amendment Offered |
2015-06-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-14 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-05-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Engrossed |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 697 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Bussman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 696 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Bussman Amendment Offered |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Orr motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |