AL SB106 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Environment, Alabama Legacy for Environmental Research Trust, abolished, Sec. 22-30B-19 repealed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environment, Alabama Legacy for Environmental Research Trust, abolished, Sec. 22-30B-19 repealed

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-23HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
2017-02-21SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 92
2017-02-21SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-02-16SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-02-07SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback