AL SB105 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to civil liability; to amend Section 6-5-332, Code of Alabama 1975, to limit the liability of members of any community emergency response team who perform emergency care at the scene of an accident or disaster.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to civil liability; to amend Section 6-5-332, Code of Alabama 1975, to limit the liability of members of any community emergency response team who perform emergency care at the scene of an accident or disaster.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 1024 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - House - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Hatcher substitution S6TQ885-1 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-09SenateEnacted
2024-05-09SenateEnacted
2024-05-02SenateDelivered to Governor
2024-05-02HouseSignature Requested
2024-05-02SenateEnrolled
2024-05-02SenateReady to Enroll
2024-05-02HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1024
2024-05-02HouseThird Reading in Second House
2024-03-06HouseRead for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
2024-03-06HouseReported Out of Committee Second House
2024-02-27HousePending House Public Safety and Homeland Security
2024-02-27HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
2024-02-27SenateEngrossed
2024-02-27SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 93
2024-02-27SenateSingleton motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 92 S6TQ885-1
2024-02-27SenateC&MG Substitute Offered S6TQ885-1
2024-02-27SenateThird Reading in House of Origin
2024-02-21SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted S6TQ885-1
2024-02-21SenateRead for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
2024-02-21SenateReported Out of Committee House of Origin
2024-02-15SenatePending Senate County and Municipal Government
2024-02-15SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on County and Municipal Government

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search
Texthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2024RS/SB105-int.pdf
Texthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2024RS/SB105-eng.pdf
Texthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2024RS/SB105-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2024RS/S6TQ885-1.pdf
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2024RS/FiscalNotes/FN-DEF6NHN-1.pdf
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2024RS/FiscalNotes/FN-DEF6NHN-2.pdf
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2024RS/FiscalNotes/FN-DEF6NHN-3.pdf
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2024RS/FiscalNotes/FN-DEF6NHN-4.pdf
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc91
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc92
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc93
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc1023
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc1024

Bill Comments

feedback