AL SB104 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Wholesale to Retail Accountability Program (WRAP) established, standardized reporting of beer and wine distributors and sellers of tobacco products for resale purposes, industry advisory group established
Title
Wholesale to Retail Accountability Program (WRAP) established, standardized reporting of beer and wine distributors and sellers of tobacco products for resale purposes, industry advisory group established
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 16 Favorable from Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development with 1 substitute |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |