AL SB10 | 2016 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-25 - Assigned Act No. 2016-466.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Manufacturers and dealers of boats, boat trailers, add'l authorization to provide temporary license plates and registration certificates, when sold out of state, Sec. 32-6-212 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Manufacturers and dealers of boats, boat trailers, add'l authorization to provide temporary license plates and registration certificates, when sold out of state, Sec. 32-6-212 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-08-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 67 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2016-08-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-08-25SenateAssigned Act No. 2016-466.
2016-08-25HouseSignature Requested
2016-08-24SenateEnrolled
2016-08-24SenatePassed Second House
2016-08-23HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 44
2016-08-23HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-08-19HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-08-17HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
2016-08-17SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 9
2016-08-17SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-08-16SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-08-15SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback