AL SB1 | 2010 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-15 - Delivered to Governor at 11:45 p.m. on 12/15/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Ethics Commission, members, appointment and confirmation, investigation of complaints, subpoena power, post-investigation referral and status reports, penalties, Secs. 36-25-3, 36-25-4, 36-25-27 am'd. (2010-21255)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ethics Commission, members, appointment and confirmation, investigation of complaints, subpoena power, post-investigation referral and status reports, penalties, Secs. 36-25-3, 36-25-4, 36-25-27 am'd. (2010-21255)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-19 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Senate - Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - House - Canfield motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - House - Canfield motion to Accede (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - House - Canfield motion to Table (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-12-15 Delivered to Governor at 11:45 p.m. on 12/15/2010
2010-12-15 Assigned Act No. 2010-763.
2010-12-15 Signature Requested
2010-12-15 Enrolled
2010-12-15 Concurred in Conference Report
2010-12-15 Canfield motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 74
2010-12-15 Conference Report Concurrence Requested
2010-12-15 Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 71
2010-12-15 Conference Committee on SB1 2010FS first Substitute Offered
2010-12-15 Conference Report
2010-12-15 Conference Committee Appointed
2010-12-15 Canfield motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 70 - Speaker appoints Canfield, Poole and Scott
2010-12-15 Conference Committee Requested
2010-12-15 Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 68 Senate appoints Ward, Keahey and Williams.
2010-12-15 Concurrence Requested
2010-12-15 Nordgren and Jackson intended to vote "Yea"
2010-12-15 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 66
2010-12-15 Canfield motion to Table adopted Roll Call 65
2010-12-15 Colston Amendment Offered
2010-12-15 Motion to Adopt pending
2010-12-15 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 63
2010-12-15 Poole Amendment Offered
2010-12-15 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 62
2010-12-15 Ethics Amendment Offered
2010-12-15 Died in Committee on 12/16/2010
2010-12-13 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2010-12-10 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ethics
2010-12-10 Engrossed
2010-12-10 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 27
2010-12-10 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 26
2010-12-10 Ward first Substitute Offered
2010-12-10 Ward motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2010-12-10 Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections Amendment Offered
2010-12-10 Ward motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2010-12-10 Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections Amendment Offered
2010-12-10 Ward motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2010-12-10 Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections Amendment Offered
2010-12-10 Ward motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2010-12-10 Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections Amendment Offered
2010-12-10 Ward motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2010-12-10 Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections Amendment Offered
2010-12-10 Third Reading Passed
2010-12-09 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 5 amendments
2010-12-08 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB1
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2010RS/PrintFiles/SB1-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=393746&VOTE=26&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1054&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=393747&VOTE=27&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1054&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=394486&VOTE=62&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1054&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=394489&VOTE=63&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1054&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=394533&VOTE=65&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1054&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=394534&VOTE=66&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1054&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=394580&VOTE=68&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1054&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=394592&VOTE=70&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1054&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=394620&VOTE=71&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1054&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=394624&VOTE=74&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1054&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback