AL HJR99 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Assigned Act No. 2018-63.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Arc of Madison County, exceptional service, commended

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Arc of Madison County, exceptional service, commended

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-01HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-63.
2018-02-01HouseDelivered to Governor at 1:59 p.m. on February 1, 2018.
2018-02-01HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-02-01HouseEnrolled
2018-02-01SenateSignature Requested
2018-02-01HousePassed Second House
2018-02-01SenateWaggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2018-02-01SenateReported from Rules
2018-01-30SenateReceived in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
2018-01-30HouseJones motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2018-01-30HouseReported from Rules as Favorable
2018-01-23HouseIntroduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback