AL HJR9 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Delivered to Governor at 6:49 p.m. on August 10, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Northport Nationals, commended

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Northport Nationals, commended

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-10HouseDelivered to Governor at 6:49 p.m. on August 10, 2015.
2015-08-10HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-511.
2015-08-10HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-08-10SenateSignature Requested
2015-08-10HouseEnrolled
2015-08-10HousePassed Second House
2015-08-10SenateWaggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2015-08-10SenateReported from Rules
2015-08-07SenateReceived in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
2015-08-07HouseMcCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2015-08-07HouseReported from Rules
2015-08-06HouseIntroduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback