AL HJR83 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Delivered to Governor at 9:55 a.m. on April 11, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Delivered to Governor at 9:55 a.m. on April 11, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
All-Alabama Academic Team, commended
Title
All-Alabama Academic Team, commended
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:55 a.m. on April 11, 2019. |
2019-04-11 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-49. |
2019-04-11 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-04-09 | House | Enrolled |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2019-04-03 | House | Warren motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2019-04-03 | House | Introduced |