AL HJR8 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-10 - Delivered to Governor at 11:48 a.m. on December 10, 2010.
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-10 - Delivered to Governor at 11:48 a.m. on December 10, 2010.
Summary
Norris, Annie Jean Williams, death mourned
Title
Norris, Annie Jean Williams, death mourned
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-10 | Delivered to Governor at 11:48 a.m. on December 10, 2010. | |
2010-12-10 | Assigned Act No. 2010-756. | |
2010-12-10 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-12-10 | Signature Requested | |
2010-12-10 | Enrolled | |
2010-12-10 | Passed Second House | |
2010-12-09 | Beason motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-12-09 | Reported from Rules | |
2010-12-09 | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules | |
2010-12-09 | Gaston motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-12-09 | Reported from Rules | |
2010-12-08 | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |
Subjects
Alabama State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/ACTIONHistoryResultsMac.asp?OID=69966&LABEL=HJR8 |