AL HJR75 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Delivered to Governor at 1:46 p.m. on March 11, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Delivered to Governor at 1:46 p.m. on March 11, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Child Abuse Prevention Month, April 2021, proclaimed
Title
Child Abuse Prevention Month, April 2021, proclaimed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - House - Collins motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 353 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:46 p.m. on March 11, 2021. |
2021-03-11 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-103. |
2021-03-11 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2021-03-11 | House | Enrolled |
2021-03-11 | House | Collins motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 353 |
2021-03-11 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Rules Amendment Offered |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Reported from Rules 1 amendment |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2021-03-03 | House | Jones (M) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2021-03-03 | House | Reported from Rules |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |