AL HJR75 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-30 - Assigned Act No. 2018-45.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-30 - Assigned Act No. 2018-45.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dixon, Martha Belvin, death mourned
Title
Dixon, Martha Belvin, death mourned
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-45. |
2018-01-30 | House | Forwarded to Governor on January 30, 2018 at 5:03 p.m. on January 30, 2018. |
2018-01-30 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-01-30 | House | Enrolled |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-01-30 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2018-01-23 | House | Jones motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2018-01-23 | House | Reported from Rules and received |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |