AL HJR7 | 2015 | Organizational Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 14 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - Forwarded to Executive Department on January 14, 2015

Summary

Joint Legislative Parking Committee, established

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Legislative Parking Committee, established

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-01-15 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-24HouseForwarded to Executive Department on January 14, 2015
2015-01-14HouseEnrolled
2015-01-14SenateSignature Requested
2015-01-14HousePassed Second House
2015-01-14SenateMarsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 24
2015-01-14SenateReceived in Senate
2015-01-13HouseSpeaker appoints Boothe, Sanderford and Hall
2015-01-13HouseGaston motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2015-01-13HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback