AL HJR60 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Forwarded to Governor at 3:11 p.m. on April 23, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Forwarded to Governor at 3:11 p.m. on April 23, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Frank McDaniel Drive, road in Lake Guntersville State Park, named
Title
Frank McDaniel Drive, road in Lake Guntersville State Park, named
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 3:11 p.m. on April 23, 2013. |
2013-04-23 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-120. |
2013-04-23 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-04-23 | House | Enrolled |
2013-04-23 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2013-02-21 | House | McCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2013-02-21 | House | Reported from Rules |
2013-02-19 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |