AL HJR570 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Delivered to Governor at 11:30 a.m. on June 1, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Delivered to Governor at 11:30 a.m. on June 1, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Barnes, Gay, commended
Title
Barnes, Gay, commended
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Ball [R] | Rep. Laura Hall [D] | Rep. Wayne Johnson [R] | Rep. Mac McCutcheon [R] |
Rep. Jim Patterson [R] | Rep. Howard Sanderford [R] | Rep. Phil Williams [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Delivered to Governor at 11:30 a.m. on June 1, 2011. | |
2011-06-01 | Assigned Act No. 2011-406 on 06/07/2011. | |
2011-06-01 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-06-01 | Signature Requested | |
2011-05-31 | Enrolled | |
2011-05-31 | Passed Second House | |
2011-05-31 | Beason motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-05-31 | Reported from Rules | |
2011-05-26 | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules | |
2011-05-25 | Galliher motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-05-25 | Reported from Rules | |
2011-05-24 | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |