AL HJR499 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-06 - Delivered to Governor at 5;30 p.m. on April 6, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-06 - Delivered to Governor at 5;30 p.m. on April 6, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dodiyos Restaurant, commended (2010-20620)
Title
Dodiyos Restaurant, commended (2010-20620)
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Ford [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-06 | Delivered to Governor at 5;30 p.m. on April 6, 2010. | |
2010-04-06 | Assigned Act No. 2010-423. | |
2010-04-06 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-04-06 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-06 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-06 | Passed Second House | |
2010-04-06 | Barron motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-04-06 | Reported from Rules | |
2010-03-11 | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules | |
2010-03-09 | Engrossed | |
2010-03-09 | Guin motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-03-09 | Motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-03-09 | Rules Substitute Offered | |
2010-03-09 | Reported from Rules with 1 substitute and | |
2010-03-03 | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |