AL HJR49 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - Forwarded to Governor on March 19, 2015 at 10:38 a.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - Forwarded to Governor on March 19, 2015 at 10:38 a.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Board of Nursing, amendment to Rule 610-x-7-.02, entitled "Delegation By School Nurses," disapproval by Joint Committee on Administrative Regulation Review sustained
Title
Board of Nursing, amendment to Rule 610-x-7-.02, entitled "Delegation By School Nurses," disapproval by Joint Committee on Administrative Regulation Review sustained
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | House | Forwarded to Governor on March 19, 2015 at 10:38 a.m. |
2015-03-19 | House | Assigned Act No. 2015-22. |
2015-03-19 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2015-03-19 | House | Enrolled |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2015-03-19 | House | Passed Second House |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Holley motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Received in Senate |
2015-03-18 | House | McCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2015-03-18 | House | Reported from Rules |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |