AL HJR444 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Delivered to Governor at 5:25 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Huntsville City School System student ambassadors, 1988 XV Winter Olympics in Calgary, Canada, recognized

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Huntsville City School System student ambassadors, 1988 XV Winter Olympics in Calgary, Canada, recognized

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27HouseDelivered to Governor at 5:25 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
2018-03-27HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-490.
2018-03-27HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-03-27HouseEnrolled
2018-03-27SenateSignature Requested
2018-03-27HousePassed Second House
2018-03-27SenateWaggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-27SenateReported from Rules
2018-03-22SenateReceived in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
2018-03-22HouseJones motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-22HouseReported from Rules
2018-03-20HouseIntroduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback