AL HJR42 | 2016 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-25 - Delivered to Governor at 4:36 p.m. on August 25, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Dixon, Mildred, 100th birthday celebration, commended

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dixon, Mildred, 100th birthday celebration, commended

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-08-25HouseDelivered to Governor at 4:36 p.m. on August 25, 2016.
2016-08-25HouseAssigned Act No. 2016-444.
2016-08-25HouseClerk of the House Certification
2016-08-25SenateSignature Requested
2016-08-25HouseEnrolled
2016-08-25HousePassed Second House
2016-08-25SenateWaggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2016-08-25SenateReported from Rules
2016-08-24SenateReceived in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
2016-08-23HouseWarren motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2016-08-23HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback