AL HJR404 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Forwarded to Governor on April 3, 2014 at 2:16 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Forwarded to Governor on April 3, 2014 at 2:16 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Moquin, Joseph C., death mourned
Title
Moquin, Joseph C., death mourned
Sponsors
Rep. Howard Sanderford [R] | Rep. Mike Ball [R] | Rep. Phil Williams [R] | Rep. Laura Hall [D] |
Rep. Mac McCutcheon [R] | Rep. Wayne Johnson [R] | Rep. Jim Patterson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Forwarded to Governor on April 3, 2014 at 2:16 p.m. on April 3, 2014. |
2014-04-03 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-360. |
2014-04-03 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-04-03 | House | Enrolled |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-04-03 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2014-04-01 | House | McCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-01 | House | Reported from Rules |
2014-03-20 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |