AL HJR382 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Forwarded to Governor on March 22, 2018 at 1:07 p.m. on March 22, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Lamb, Neil - Commending

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lamb, Neil - Commending

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22HouseForwarded to Governor on March 22, 2018 at 1:07 p.m. on March 22, 2018.
2018-03-22HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-437.
2018-03-22HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-03-22HouseEnrolled
2018-03-22SenateSignature Requested
2018-03-22HousePassed Second House
2018-03-21SenateWaggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-21SenateReported from Rules
2018-03-20SenateReceived in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
2018-03-20HouseJones motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-20HouseReported from Rules
2018-03-13HouseIntroduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback