AL HJR38 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-6)
Status: Passed on December 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-15 - Delivered to Governor at 7:45 p.m. on December 15, 2010.
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-6)
Status: Passed on December 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-15 - Delivered to Governor at 7:45 p.m. on December 15, 2010.
Summary
Newton, Cameron, commended
Title
Newton, Cameron, commended
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Baker [R] | Rep. Mike Ball [R] | Rep. Jim Barton [R] | Rep. Richard Baughn [R] |
Rep. Paul Beckman [R] | Rep. Elaine Beech [D] | Rep. Daniel Boman [R] | Rep. Napoleon Bracy [D] |
Sen. Donnie Chesteen [R] | Rep. Steve Clouse [R] | Rep. Terri Collins [R] | Rep. David Colston [D] |
Rep. Paul DeMarco [R] | Rep. Chad Fincher [R] | Rep. Craig Ford [D] | Rep. Victor Gaston [R] |
Rep. Lynn Greer [R] | Rep. Laura Hall [D] | Rep. Ed Henry [R] | Rep. Mike Hubbard [R] |
Rep. James Ison [R] | Rep. Mike Jones [R] | Rep. Paul Lee [R] | Rep. Barry Mask [R] |
Rep. Mary McClurkin [R] | Rep. Mac McCutcheon [R] | Rep. Becky Nordgren [R] | Rep. Harry Shiver [R] |
Rep. Mark Tuggle [R] | Rep. Kurt Wallace [R] | Rep. Pebblin Warren [D] | Sen. April Weaver [R] |
Rep. Phil Williams [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-15 | Delivered to Governor at 7:45 p.m. on December 15, 2010. | |
2010-12-15 | Assigned Act No. 2010-785. | |
2010-12-15 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-12-15 | Signature Requested | |
2010-12-15 | Enrolled | |
2010-12-15 | Passed Second House | |
2010-12-15 | Beason motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-12-15 | Reported from Rules | |
2010-12-15 | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules | |
2010-12-14 | Gaston motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-12-14 | Reported from Rules | |
2010-12-13 | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |
Subjects
Alabama State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/ACTIONHistoryResultsMac.asp?OID=70138&LABEL=HJR38 |