AL HJR375 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Holmes, Representative Alvin, commended
Title
Holmes, Representative Alvin, commended
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Enrolled |
2017-05-09 | House | Enrolled |
2017-05-09 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 5:27 p.m. on May 9, 2017. |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-292. |
2017-05-09 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-05-09 | House | Enrolled |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2017-05-04 | House | Boothe motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2017-05-04 | House | Reported from Rules as |
2017-04-27 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |