AL HJR35 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-18 - Delivered to Governor at 11:10 a.m. on February 18, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-18 - Delivered to Governor at 11:10 a.m. on February 18, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Kramer, Luther Eyer, III, death mourned
Title
Kramer, Luther Eyer, III, death mourned
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Ball [R] | Rep. Laura Hall [D] | Rep. Randy Hinshaw [D] | Rep. Mac McCutcheon [R] |
Rep. Howard Sanderford [R] | Rep. Butch Taylor [D] | Rep. Phil Williams [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-18 | Delivered to Governor at 11:10 a.m. on February 18, 2010. | |
2010-02-18 | Assigned Act No. 2010-46. | |
2010-02-18 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-02-18 | Signature Requested | |
2010-02-17 | Enrolled | |
2010-02-17 | Passed Second House | |
2010-02-17 | Butler motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-02-17 | Received in Senate | |
2010-01-14 | Guin motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-01-14 | Reported from Rules | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |