AL HJR34 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Delivered to Governor at 4:34 p.m. on March 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Delivered to Governor at 4:34 p.m. on March 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Trauma Systems, Joint Committee on Statewide Trauma System Funding, recreated
Title
Trauma Systems, Joint Committee on Statewide Trauma System Funding, recreated
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Oliver [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:34 p.m. on March 1, 2022. |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-97. |
2022-03-01 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-03-01 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-01 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2022-02-10 | House | Jones (M) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported from Rules |
2022-02-02 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |