AL HJR33 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Assigned Act No. 2018-113.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Assigned Act No. 2018-113.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Keahey, Ronnie E., death mourned
Title
Keahey, Ronnie E., death mourned
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - House - Jackson motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-113. |
2018-02-15 | House | Forwarded to Governor on February 15, 2018 at 2:55 p.m. on February 15, 2018. |
2018-02-15 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-02-15 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-02-15 | House | Second House Concurs in Executive Amendment |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Albritton motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2018-02-15 | Senate | House of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment |
2018-02-13 | House | Jackson motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 323 |
2018-02-13 | House | Executive Amendment Offered |
2018-02-13 | House | Forwarded to Governor |
2018-01-25 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-01-23 | House | Enrolled |
2018-01-23 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2018-01-16 | House | Jones motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2018-01-16 | House | Reported from Rules |
2018-01-11 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |