AL HJR327 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Assigned Act No. 2010-170.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Assigned Act No. 2010-170.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Russell-McCloud, Patricia, commended
Title
Russell-McCloud, Patricia, commended
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Assigned Act No. 2010-170. | |
2010-03-02 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-03-02 | Signature Requested | |
2010-02-25 | Enrolled | |
2010-02-25 | Passed Second House | |
2010-02-25 | Smitherman motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-02-25 | Received in Senate | |
2010-02-17 | Guin motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-02-17 | Reported from Rules | |
2010-02-16 | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |