AL HJR316 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-19 - Delivered to Governor at 2:10 p. m. on April 19, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-19 - Delivered to Governor at 2:10 p. m. on April 19, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sumlin, Lillie Mae, death mourned
Title
Sumlin, Lillie Mae, death mourned
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-19 | Delivered to Governor at 2:10 p. m. on April 19, 2012. | |
2012-04-19 | Assigned Act No. 2012-246. | |
2012-04-19 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-04-19 | Signature Requested | |
2012-04-19 | Enrolled | |
2012-04-19 | Passed Second House | |
2012-04-19 | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-04-19 | Reported from Rules | |
2012-04-03 | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules | |
2012-04-03 | Galliher motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-04-03 | Reported from Rules | |
2012-03-22 | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |