AL HJR30 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 1:40 p.m. on April 22, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 1:40 p.m. on April 22, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
High School Athletic Association requested to consider authorizing fishing as a recognized school sport
Title
High School Athletic Association requested to consider authorizing fishing as a recognized school sport
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | Delivered to Governor at 1:40 p.m. on April 22, 2010. | |
2010-04-22 | Assigned Act No. 2010-636. | |
2010-04-22 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-04-22 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-22 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-22 | Passed Second House | |
2010-04-22 | Barron motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-04-22 | Reported from Rules | |
2010-01-19 | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules | |
2010-01-14 | Guin motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-01-14 | Reported from Rules | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |