AL HJR29 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-21 - Delivered to Governor at 5:25 p. m. on February 21, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-21 - Delivered to Governor at 5:25 p. m. on February 21, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Naming a portion of U.S. Hwy 431 Northbound in Madison County between mile markers 343 and 344, the Fallen Officer Hwy: Deputy Sheriff Thomas R. Lewis
Title
Naming a portion of U.S. Hwy 431 Northbound in Madison County between mile markers 343 and 344, the Fallen Officer Hwy: Deputy Sheriff Thomas R. Lewis
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-21 | Delivered to Governor at 5:25 p. m. on February 21, 2012. | |
2012-02-21 | Assigned Act No. 2012-26. | |
2012-02-21 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-02-21 | Signature Requested | |
2012-02-16 | Enrolled | |
2012-02-16 | Passed Second House | |
2012-02-16 | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-02-16 | Reported from Rules | |
2012-02-09 | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules | |
2012-02-09 | Galliher motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-02-09 | Reported from Rules | |
2012-02-07 | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |