AL HJR27 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Forwarded to Governor at 12:25 p.m. on March 15, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Forwarded to Governor at 12:25 p.m. on March 15, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Board of Education, urged to search nationwide for best candidate for Superintendent
Title
State Board of Education, urged to search nationwide for best candidate for Superintendent
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 12:25 p.m. on March 15, 2018. |
2018-03-15 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-342. |
2018-03-15 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-03-15 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-15 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2018-01-11 | House | Jones motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2018-01-11 | House | Reported from Rules |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |