AL HJR24 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Delivered to Governor on March 9, 2021 at 4:23 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Delivered to Governor on March 9, 2021 at 4:23 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Day of Tears, recognized
Title
Day of Tears, recognized
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | House | Delivered to Governor on March 9, 2021 at 4:23 p.m. |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-88. |
2021-03-09 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-03-09 | House | Enrolled |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2021-02-11 | House | Rowe motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2021-02-11 | House | Reported from Rules |
2021-02-03 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |