AL HJR24 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-25 - Assigned Act No. 2018-24.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Finebaum, Paul, commended

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Finebaum, Paul, commended

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-25HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-24.
2018-01-25HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:47 a.m. on January 25, 2018.
2018-01-25HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-01-25SenateSignature Requested
2018-01-23HouseEnrolled
2018-01-23HousePassed Second House
2018-01-23SenateWaggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2018-01-23SenateReported from Rules
2018-01-11SenateReceived in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
2018-01-11HouseJones motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2018-01-11HouseReported from Rules
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback