AL HJR234 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

RECOGNIZING THE 2023 NAVY SEAL FOUNDATION NEW YORK CITY SEAL SWIM.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RECOGNIZING THE 2023 NAVY SEAL FOUNDATION NEW YORK CITY SEAL SWIM.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-01HouseEnacted
2023-06-01HouseEnrolled
2023-06-01SenateReady to Enroll
2023-05-31SenateConcur In and Adopt
2023-05-31SenateRead Second Time in Second House
2023-05-26SenateReported Out of Committee in Second House
2023-05-26SenateReported Favorably from Senate RULES
2023-05-25SenateReferred to Committee to Senate RULES
2023-05-25HouseRead First Time in Second House
2023-05-25HousePassed by House of Origin
2023-05-25HouseRead Second Time in House of Origin
2023-05-25HouseReported Out of Committee in House of Origin
2023-05-25HouseReported Favorably from House RULES
2023-05-24HouseIntroduced and Referred to House RULES
2023-05-24HouseRead First Time in House of Origin

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback