AL HJR231 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Delivered to Governor at 7:24 p.m. on May 17, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Delivered to Governor at 7:24 p.m. on May 17, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Violence, threats of violence against Asian American people, condemn
Title
Violence, threats of violence against Asian American people, condemn
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Wood [R] | Rep. Barbara Boyd [D] | Rep. K.L. Brown [R] | Rep. Stephen Hurst [R] |
Rep. Becky Nordgren [R] | Rep. Ginny Shaver [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | House | Delivered to Governor at 7:24 p.m. on May 17, 2021. |
2021-05-17 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-524. |
2021-05-17 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-05-17 | House | Enrolled |
2021-05-17 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2021-04-29 | House | Jones (M) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2021-04-29 | House | Reported from Rules |
2021-04-22 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |
Same As/Similar To
HJR182 (Same As) 2021-04-07 - Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules