AL HJR225 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Delivered to Governor at 10:27 a.m. on March 15, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

NASA's Marshall Space Flight Center and May, Todd, commended

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NASA's Marshall Space Flight Center and May, Todd, commended

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:27 a.m. on March 15, 2018.
2018-03-15HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-345.
2018-03-15HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-03-15SenateSignature Requested
2018-03-13HouseEnrolled
2018-03-13HousePassed Second House
2018-03-13SenateWaggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-13SenateReported from Rules
2018-03-06SenateReceived in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
2018-03-01HouseJones motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-01HouseReported from Rules as Favorable
2018-02-22HouseIntroduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback