AL HJR201 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Forwarded to Governor at 4:26 p.m. on April 20,2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Forwarded to Governor at 4:26 p.m. on April 20,2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Davis, Ed, death mourned
Title
Davis, Ed, death mourned
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 4:26 p.m. on April 20,2021. |
2021-04-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-292. |
2021-04-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-04-20 | House | Enrolled |
2021-04-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Reported from Rules and received |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2021-04-13 | House | Grimsley motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2021-04-13 | House | Howard motion to Suspend Rules adopted Voice Vote |
2021-04-13 | House | Joint Rule 11 |