AL HJR181 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Forwarded to Governor on April 15, 2021 at 11:50 p.m. on April 15, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Forwarded to Governor on April 15, 2021 at 11:50 p.m. on April 15, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ferniany, Will, commended
Title
Ferniany, Will, commended
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | Forwarded to Governor on April 15, 2021 at 11:50 p.m. on April 15, 2021. |
2021-04-15 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-258. |
2021-04-15 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-04-15 | House | Enrolled |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-04-15 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Reported from Rules as Favorable |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2021-04-13 | House | Jones (M) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2021-04-13 | House | Reported from Rules |
2021-04-07 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |