AL HJR150 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Korea, Republic of, host of the 2018 XXIII Winter Olympic Games and XII Winter Paralympic Games, recognized

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Korea, Republic of, host of the 2018 XXIII Winter Olympic Games and XII Winter Paralympic Games, recognized

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15HouseEnrolled
2018-02-15HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-123.
2018-02-15HouseForwarded to Governor on February 15, 2018 at 2:55 p.m. on February 15, 2018.
2018-02-15HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-02-15HouseEnrolled
2018-02-15SenateSignature Requested
2018-02-15HousePassed Second House
2018-02-15SenateWaggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2018-02-15SenateReported from Rules
2018-02-13SenateReceived in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
2018-02-13HouseJones motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2018-02-13HouseReported from Rules
2018-02-06HouseIntroduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback