AL HJR15 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-08 - Forwarded to Governor on February 8, 2022 at 4:26 p.m. on February 8, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-08 - Forwarded to Governor on February 8, 2022 at 4:26 p.m. on February 8, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Puckett, Prince Carson Kaleo, death mourned
Title
Puckett, Prince Carson Kaleo, death mourned
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | House | Forwarded to Governor on February 8, 2022 at 4:26 p.m. on February 8, 2021. |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-10. |
2022-02-08 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-02-08 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-02-08 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2022-01-18 | House | Meadows motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2022-01-18 | House | Introduced |