AL HJR142 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Forwarded to Governor at 3:06 p.m. on May 7, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Forwarded to Governor at 3:06 p.m. on May 7, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Hospitals, urged to offer flu vaccines to inpatients over 65 upon discharge
Title
Hospitals, urged to offer flu vaccines to inpatients over 65 upon discharge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 3:06 p.m. on May 7, 2015. |
2015-05-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2015-170 on 05/14/2015. |
2015-05-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2015-05-07 | House | Enrolled |
2015-05-07 | House | Passed Second House |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2015-04-23 | House | McCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2015-04-23 | House | Reported from Rules |
2015-04-21 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |