AL HJR131 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Assigned Act No. 2018-104 on 02/20/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Limestone, Madison, and Morgan Counties, first responders honored

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limestone, Madison, and Morgan Counties, first responders honored

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-104 on 02/20/2018.
2018-02-13HouseDelivered to Governor at 4:52 p.m. on February 13, 2018.
2018-02-13HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-02-13SenateSignature Requested
2018-02-13HouseEnrolled
2018-02-13HousePassed Second House
2018-02-13SenateWaggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2018-02-13SenateReported from Rules
2018-02-08SenateReceived in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
2018-02-08HouseJones motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2018-02-08HouseReported from Rules as Favorable
2018-02-01HouseIntroduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback