AL HB9 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Health and Human Services first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Youth sports, coaches and certain others involved in high risk youth athletics, injury mitigation course approved by Public Health Dept. required annually

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Youth sports, coaches and certain others involved in high risk youth athletics, injury mitigation course approved by Public Health Dept. required annually

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - Williams (JD) motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Williams (JD) motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 75 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 82 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateHealth and Human Services first Amendment Offered
2018-03-27HouseDelivered to Governor at 2:28 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
2018-03-27HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-496.
2018-03-27HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-03-27SenateSignature Requested
2018-03-22HouseEnrolled
2018-03-22HouseSecond House Concurs in Executive Amendment
2018-03-22SenateWaggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1089
2018-03-22SenateHouse of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment
2018-03-21HouseWilliams (JD) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 940
2018-03-21HouseExecutive Amendment Offered
2018-03-21HouseForwarded to Governor
2018-03-13HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-03-13SenateSignature Requested
2018-03-13SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2018-03-08HouseEnrolled
2018-03-08HouseWilliams (JD) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 690
2018-03-08HouseConcurrence Requested
2018-03-08SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 741
2018-03-08SenateWaggoner motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 740
2018-03-08SenateHealth and Human Services Amendment Offered
2018-03-08SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-01SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2018-02-01SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services
2018-01-30HouseEngrossed
2018-01-30HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 141
2018-01-30HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 140
2018-01-30HouseWilliams (JD) Amendment Offered
2018-01-30HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 139
2018-01-30HouseEducation Policy Amendment resumed
2018-01-30HouseFurther Consideration
2018-01-30HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-01-30HouseWilliams (JD) motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2018-01-30HouseEducation Policy Amendment Offered
2018-01-30HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2018-01-25HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2018-01-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB9&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB9-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB9-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB9-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/190038-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/190843-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/192340-3.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/193790-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=584507&VOTE=139&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=584509&VOTE=140&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=584514&VOTE=141&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=594422&VOTE=740&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=594423&VOTE=741&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=594556&VOTE=690&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=598595&VOTE=940&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=600395&VOTE=1089&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback