AL HB789 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Assigned Act No. 2010-606.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Baldwin Co., Stockton Landmark District, boundaries defined, annexation by local law prohibited, const. amend. (2010-20834)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baldwin Co., Stockton Landmark District, boundaries defined, annexation by local law prohibited, const. amend. (2010-20834)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-22 Assigned Act No. 2010-606.
2010-04-22 Delivered to Secretary of State at 12:14 p.m. on April 22, 2010.
2010-04-22 Clerk of the House Certification
2010-04-22 Signature Requested
2010-04-22 Enrolled
2010-04-22 Passed Second House
2010-04-22 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1176
2010-04-22 Third Reading Passed
2010-04-21 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-04-14 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
2010-04-14 Engrossed
2010-04-14 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1076
2010-04-14 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1075
2010-04-14 Motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2010-04-14 Baldwin County Legislation first Substitute Offered
2010-04-14 Third Reading Passed
2010-04-14 McMillan motion to temporarily carried over adopted voice vote
2010-04-01 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2010-03-30 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback